TN SB0797 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes an obsolete reference to a nine-person task force that was assigned to review oversight, utilization, and the future need for ICF/MR services and make recommendations to the general assembly and governor by June 30, 2007. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 56 and Title 71, relative to TennCare.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0856 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.