TN SB0797 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes $180 fee for an individual petitioning the court for an expunction of certain criminal offenses; removes $350 fee for a defendant applying for expunction of an offense following the completion of a diversion program. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, removes $180 fee for an individual petitioning the court for an expunction of certain criminal offenses; removes $350 fee for a defendant applying for expunction of an offense following the completion of a diversion program. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 32 and Title 40, Chapter 35.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-15HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-11SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-10SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-10HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-10HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0134)
2019-04-10HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-01HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-28SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-03-28SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0063)
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019
2019-03-26SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-03-05SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0941 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback