TN SB0793 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner to annually report on the effectiveness of present law in regulating boilers and make recommendations for improvements to the law to the business and utilities committee of the house and the commerce and labor committee of the senate. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68, Chapter 122.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner to annually report on the effectiveness of present law in regulating boilers and make recommendations for improvements to the law to the business and utilities committee of the house and the commerce and labor committee of the senate. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68, Chapter 122.
Sponsors
Sen. Mae Beavers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0729 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-19 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0793&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0793.pdf |