TN SB0787 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes the authorization in present law that two or more central business improvement districts may overlap and encompass some or all of the same properties. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 84.
Title
As introduced, deletes the authorization in present law that two or more central business improvement districts may overlap and encompass some or all of the same properties. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 84.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 03/17/2010 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1920 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-04 - Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0787&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0787.pdf |