TN SB0753 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Failed in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Failed in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to release certain percentages of test questions and answers from the Tennessee comprehensive assessment program (TCAP) tests and end-of-course examinations to LEAs and public schools. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to release certain percentages of test questions and answers from the Tennessee comprehensive assessment program (TCAP) tests and end-of-course examinations to LEAs and public schools. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Education Committee (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Failed in Senate Education Committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1246 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019