TN SB0752 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Natural Marriage Defense Act," which states the policy of Tennessee to defend natural marriage between one man and one woman regardless of any court decision to the contrary. - Amends TCA Title 36.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Natural Marriage Defense Act," which states the policy of Tennessee to defend natural marriage between one man and one woman regardless of any court decision to the contrary. - Amends TCA Title 36.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-15SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0892 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-29 - Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 1st Calendar of 2018

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback