TN SB0742 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Pub. Ch. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, specifies that a personal property schedule may be amended only for certain reasons and that the failure of a taxpayer to receive the schedule would not excuse the taxpayer from filing the schedule by March 1. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, specifies that a personal property schedule may be amended only for certain reasons and that the failure of a taxpayer to receive the schedule would not excuse the taxpayer from filing the schedule by March 1. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-28 Pub. Ch. 93
2011-04-28 Effective date(s) 04/21/11
2011-04-21 Signed by Governor.
2011-04-11 Transmitted to Gov. for action.
2011-04-11 Signed by H. Speaker
2011-04-06 Signed by S. Speaker
2011-04-05 Enrolled and ready for signatures
2011-04-04 Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0
2011-04-04 Subst. for comp. HB.
2011-03-28 Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2011-03-24 Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
2011-03-24 Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0
2011-03-22 Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 3/24/2011
2011-03-22 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2011-03-16 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/22/2011
2011-02-17 P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
2011-02-16 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-15 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0883 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 93

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback