TN SB0732 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the commissioner to designate an additional designee to keep a record of the department's transactions. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 6 and Title 4, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 6 and Title 4, Chapter 6, relative to the department of correction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0068 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-13 - Caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.