TN SB0708 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes name of the "council on pensions and insurance" to the "council on pensions"; removes bills involving insurance from council's purview; removes requirement that bills reported out of the council have the council's committee amendments attached to be considered by the standing committee. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 9; Title 4; Title 8 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3, Chapter 9; Title 4; Title 8 and Title 67, relative to the council on pensions and insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 303 | |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0983 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 303