TN SB0708 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 265
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing place of assessment. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 53; Title 48; Title 64 and Section 67-5-502.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing place of assessment. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 53; Title 48; Title 64 and Section 67-5-502.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 265 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 04/30/2019 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2019-04-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0213) |
2019-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0155) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1269 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 265