TN SB0708 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Comprehensive Local Correctional Enforcement Task Force Act" to create a task force to conduct a study and make a report and recommendation concerning local correctional facilities by January 15, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Comprehensive Local Correctional Enforcement Task Force Act" to create a task force to conduct a study and make a report and recommendation concerning local correctional facilities by January 15, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 40 and Title 41.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0911 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee