TN SB0705 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows certain local governmental entities to enter into memoranda of understanding with employee representative organizations. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows certain local governmental entities to enter into memoranda of understanding with employee representative organizations. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 50.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-13 Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
2011-02-17 P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
2011-02-16 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-14 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1138 (Crossfiled) 2012-01-25 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback