TN SB0694 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/22/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates an exception to certain offenses for persons transporting hemp concentrate with a THC content that does not exceed 5 percent from the place where the concentrate was produced to a place where the concentrate will be diluted into products with a THC content that does not exceed 0.3 percent; enacts related requirements and authorizes the commissioner of agriculture to provide, on at least a quarterly basis, a list of persons with a hemp license to the department of safety, for the department's publication on the department's website. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 43, Chapter 27.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 43, Chapter 27, relative to hemp.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 80 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Effective date(s) 04/22/2022 | |
2022-04-26 | Pub. Ch. 907 | |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 1 (Amendment 1 - HA0779) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 80, Nays 7, PNV 5 |
2022-04-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0779) |
2022-04-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0715 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 907