TN SB0686 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that contracts between wholesalers and manufacturers for more than seven years are contrary to public policy of the state; defines "good cause" for purposes of terminating a contract between a wholesaler and a manufacturer. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that contracts between wholesalers and manufacturers for more than seven years are contrary to public policy of the state; defines "good cause" for purposes of terminating a contract between a wholesaler and a manufacturer. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0706 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-19 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0686&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0686.pdf |