TN SB0670 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 344
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 344
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions of the ignition interlock law. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions of the ignition interlock law. - Amends TCA Title 55.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/ amendendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-21 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 344 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - SA0447) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0410) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0263) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/15/2013 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. w/ am., ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2013 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0353 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 344