TN SB0657 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-13 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises reporting requirements for the all payer claims database to exclude self-funded employer sponsored health insurance plans; establishes a Tennessee all payer claims database task force. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Section 56-2-125.
Title
As introduced, revises reporting requirements for the all payer claims database to exclude self-funded employer sponsored health insurance plans; establishes a Tennessee all payer claims database task force. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Section 56-2-125.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0271) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0701 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee