TN SB0635 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that, for purposes of the offense of unlawfully passing a youth bus, the term "youth bus" includes tour buses and other vehicles carrying not less than 15 passengers. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 49 and Title 55.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that, for purposes of the offense of unlawfully passing a youth bus, the term "youth bus" includes tour buses and other vehicles carrying not less than 15 passengers. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 49 and Title 55.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1161 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee