TN SB0618 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 342
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 342
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds the commissioner of agriculture and the dean of the Tennessee State University, college of agriculture cooperative extension program as members of the state fair and exposition commission. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 57.
Title
As enacted, adds the commissioner of agriculture and the dean of the Tennessee State University, college of agriculture cooperative extension program as members of the state fair and exposition commission. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 57.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 342 | |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0815 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 342