TN SB0614 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department to include data related to complications of induced abortions, including the number of complications and the types of complications, in its annual report of selected induced termination of pregnancy data. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, requires the department to include data related to complications of induced abortions, including the number of complications and the types of complications, in its annual report of selected induced termination of pregnancy data. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Pub. Ch. 307 | |
2019-05-13 | Effective date(s) 05/08/2019; 07/07/2019 | |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 77, Nays 17, PNV 3 |
2019-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0177) |
2019-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 4 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0301) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0711 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 307