TN SB0586 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits general assembly from raising tax rate on food above 5.5% beginning on July 1, 2011. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, prohibits general assembly from raising tax rate on food above 5.5% beginning on July 1, 2011. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Lowe Finney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/neg recommend | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-04-25 | Action def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. | |
2011-04-19 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 4/25/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Action def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Action def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on S. Tax Sub-Com. cal. for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2011-02-16 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2011-02-14 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0522 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-19 - Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 5/19/2011
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0586&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0586.pdf |