TN SB0581 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases the number of BEP funded full-time public school nurse positions from one for every 3,000 students to one for every 750 students; increases the number of full-time public school nurses considered sufficient for the public school nurse program to adequately provide services from one nurse for every 3,000 students to one nurse for every 750 students. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 68, Chapter 1, Part 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49 and Title 68, Chapter 1, Part 12, relative to school nurses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-22SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
2021-03-24SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-18SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/24/2021
2021-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0537 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback