TN SB0581 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 157
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, provides for the placement of abused animals with any governmental animal control agency, law enforcement agency, or their designee and deletes provision allowing for the suspension of required security bonds for indigent persons charged with offenses against animals. - Amends TCA Section 39-14-210.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, provides for the placement of abused animals with any governmental animal control agency, law enforcement agency, or their designee and deletes provision allowing for the suspension of required security bonds for indigent persons charged with offenses against animals. - Amends TCA Section 39-14-210.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-24HousePub. Ch. 157
2013-04-24HouseEffective date(s) 07/01/2013
2013-04-16HouseSigned by Governor.
2013-04-04HouseTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-04-04HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2013-04-04HouseSigned by S. Speaker
2013-04-03HouseEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-04-03HousePassed H., Ayes 91, Nays 1
2013-04-03SenateRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2013-04-03SenateSubst. for comp. HB.
2013-04-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-04-01SenatePassed S., Ayes 28, Nays 0
2013-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/1/2013
2013-03-26SenateRec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2013-03-20SenatePlaced on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013
2013-02-06SenateP2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2013-02-04SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-30SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0462 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 157

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback