TN SB0558 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 976
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Tom Cronan Physical Education Act". - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Tom Cronan Physical Education Act". - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23 Pub. Ch. 976
2018-05-23 Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
2018-05-21SenateSigned by Governor.
2018-05-09SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2018-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-05-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-30SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2018-04-24SenateConcurred, Ayes 30, Nays 1 (Amendment 2 - HA1257)
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018
2018-04-23HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-23HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA1257)
2018-04-23HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0261)
2018-04-23HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2018-01-09HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2017-05-09SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-09SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2017-05-09SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 2
2017-05-09SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0173)
2017-05-08SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/9/2017
2017-05-08SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 5-9-17
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 5/8/2017
2017-05-03SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017
2017-05-02SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017
2017-05-01SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017
2017-05-01SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2017
2017-03-28SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-22SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-22SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/22/2017
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2017
2017-02-09SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2017-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0372 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 976

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback