TN SB0554 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-26 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes standard for when a court may terminate parental rights to a child who was conceived as the result of the parent's rape of the mother from a criminal conviction to clear and convincing evidence that the rape occurred. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, changes standard for when a court may terminate parental rights to a child who was conceived as the result of the parent's rape of the mother from a criminal conviction to clear and convincing evidence that the rape occurred. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 2 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0408) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0349 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee