TN SB0531 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-14 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-14 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds University of Tennessee System and Board of Regents as recipients of THEC's annual report on scholarship and grant programs data. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 31; Title 4, Chapter 51; Title 8, Chapter 4; Title 9, Chapter 4 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, adds University of Tennessee System and Board of Regents as recipients of THEC's annual report on scholarship and grant programs data. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 31; Title 4, Chapter 51; Title 8, Chapter 4; Title 9, Chapter 4 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-14 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-02-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0133 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0531&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0531.pdf |