TN SB0528 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/27/2023
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/27/2023
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes various changes to adoption law, including reducing the waiting period before finalization of adoption in certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 36; Title 37 and Title 68, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36; Title 37 and Title 68, Chapter 3, Part 3, relative to children.
Sponsors
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] |
Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/27/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0551 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-22 - Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/29/2023