TN SB0523 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Topical Medical Waste Reduction Act of 2023," which establishes certain regulations of facility-provided medications. - Amends TCA Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 53; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to medical waste.
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] |
Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment No. 1 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Effective date(s) 04/13/2023 | |
2023-04-18 | Pub. Ch. 150 | |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0072) |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 3/23/2023 |
2023-03-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-03-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0072) |
2023-03-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-03-02 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0047) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/27/2023 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/22/2023 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0495 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 150