TN SB0511 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires registration with the department to operate as a commercial dog breeder; creates inspection requirements for commercial dog breeders; creates Class A misdemeanor offense for a person to knowingly operate as a commercial dog breeder without being registered. - Amends TCA Title 62.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62, relative to professional registration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0547 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-03 - Sponsor(s) Added.