TN SB0511 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, schedules the sunset date of the Tennessee radiologic imaging and radiation therapy board of examiners to be June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63.
Title
As enacted, schedules the sunset date of the Tennessee radiologic imaging and radiation therapy board of examiners to be June 30, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Pub. Ch. 305 | |
2019-05-13 | Effective date(s) 05/08/2019 | |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0426) |
2019-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0135) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0724 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 305