TN SB0493 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows the department of education to post its annual report on its website in lieu of distributing the report. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, allows the department of education to post its annual report on its website in lieu of distributing the report. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0708 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee