TN SB0493 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Pub. Ch. 122
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes special requirements for the expedited issuance of certain licenses, the temporary extension of certain licenses, and the granting of certain credit for certain service members. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 13; Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8; Title 49, Chapter 9; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, establishes special requirements for the expedited issuance of certain licenses, the temporary extension of certain licenses, and the granting of certain credit for certain service members. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 13; Title 49, Chapter 7; Title 49, Chapter 8; Title 49, Chapter 9; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | Pub. Ch. 122 |
2013-04-24 | House | Effective date(s) 04/12/2013; 07/01/2013 |
2013-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-04-02 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-03-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-03-26 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-03-21 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-03-21 | House | S. concurred in H. am. 2 |
2013-03-19 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 3/21/2013 |
2013-03-18 | House | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/21/2013 |
2013-03-14 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 3/18/2013 |
2013-03-14 | House | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/18/2013 |
2013-03-12 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 3/14/2013 |
2013-03-11 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2013-03-11 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0040) |
2013-03-11 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0039) |
2013-03-11 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0018) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 2/25/2013 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. S&L Gov. Comm. to 2/19/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 2/12/2013 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0422 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 122