TN SB0475 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises and adds various provisions for purposes of regulating vendors of licensees; revises provisions relating to applications, fees, and penalties; authorizes the sports wagering council to keep certain moneys for administrative purposes; revises provisions relating to recordkeeping and inspections for licensees and registrants. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 47.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 39, Chapter 17 and Title 47, relative to sports .
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 1 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2023 | |
2023-05-24 | Pub. Ch. 450 | |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-05-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 27, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0459) |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 26, Nays 2 (Amendment 1 - HA0157) |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 4/21/2023 |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-21 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 75, Nays 7, PNV 11 |
2023-04-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0459) |
2023-04-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0157) |
2023-04-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-04-17 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0212) |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/13/2023 |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/5/2023 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/11/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1362 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 450