TN SB0445 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a private cause of action for a party that is adversely affected by a local ordinance, resolution, policy, rule, or other enactment on firearms that is preempted by state law; restricts certain actions by local government in regard to handgun carry permittees. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As enacted, creates a private cause of action for a party that is adversely affected by a local ordinance, resolution, policy, rule, or other enactment on firearms that is preempted by state law; restricts certain actions by local government in regard to handgun carry permittees. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 20 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 467 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 5-9-17 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 calendar for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on heel of Regular calendar 5/8/17 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 3 calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0508 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 467