TN SB0442 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Companion House Bill substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that only a person who had a reasonable expectation of privacy in a searched cellular phone may object to the admission of evidence of cellular phone data or evidence derived from the data. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, specifies that only a person who had a reasonable expectation of privacy in a searched cellular phone may object to the admission of evidence of cellular phone data or evidence derived from the data. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0632 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-14 - Failed to pass Senate, Ayes 11, Nays 18, PNV 1