TN SB0439 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 65
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Pub. Ch. 65
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes executive director of the Tennessee wildlife resources agency to issue various types of special permits, up to five in a license year, to nonprofit wildlife conservation organizations, rather than to issue only special elk-take permits to such organizations. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 2, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, authorizes executive director of the Tennessee wildlife resources agency to issue various types of special permits, up to five in a license year, to nonprofit wildlife conservation organizations, rather than to issue only special elk-take permits to such organizations. - Amends TCA Title 70, Chapter 2, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Pub. Ch. 65 | |
2019-04-09 | Effective date(s) 03/28/2019 | |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-03-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 1, PNV 1 |
2019-03-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0023) |
2019-03-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-14 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0024) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0318 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 65