TN SB0436 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires retail pet stores to provide certain information to consumers in connection with purchases of dogs; prohibits retail pet stores from sourcing dogs from breeders that have committed certain violations; classifies certain violations as a Class C misdemeanor offense punishable by fine only. - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 17 and Title 47.
Title
As introduced, requires retail pet stores to provide certain information to consumers in connection with purchases of dogs; prohibits retail pet stores from sourcing dogs from breeders that have committed certain violations; classifies certain violations as a Class C misdemeanor offense punishable by fine only. - Amends TCA Title 44, Chapter 17 and Title 47.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., & Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0281 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Committee