TN SB0436 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides standing to the speaker of the senate and the speaker of the house of representatives, jointly, or a majority of the members of both houses in certain legal proceedings. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1; Title 4 and Title 8, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, provides standing to the speaker of the senate and the speaker of the house of representatives, jointly, or a majority of the members of both houses in certain legal proceedings. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1; Title 4 and Title 8, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Recalled from Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0558 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-05 - Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2018