TN SB0430 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, defines the AMA guide for impairment ratings to mean the 5th edition of the Guides, instead of either the 6th edition or any new edition that is designated by the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, defines the AMA guide for impairment ratings to mean the 5th edition of the Guides, instead of either the 6th edition or any new edition that is designated by the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 5/5/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Action Def. in S. C,L&A Comm. to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-02-24 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of of S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-02-18 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 02/24/2009 | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1574 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-28 - Action Def. in s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA to 2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0430&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0430.pdf |