TN SB0411 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Balance of Powers Act." - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 38, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Balance of Powers Act." - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 38, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Recalled from S. Gov Ops. Comm. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0411&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0411.pdf |