TN SB0408 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits a Tennessee resident who has been residing outside the United States due to employment to apply for a one-time license to ship wine purchased by the individual to this state. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As introduced, permits a Tennessee resident who has been residing outside the United States due to employment to apply for a one-time license to ship wine purchased by the individual to this state. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
Sen. John Stevens [R] | Sen. Mark Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1389 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-15 - Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee