TN SB0402 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Enrolled and ready for signatures
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, permits a designation as joint primary residential parents or a waiver of the primary residential parent designation upon agreement of the parents when the child is scheduled to reside an equal amount of time with both parents; allows the address of either parent to be used to determine school zoning when the child is scheduled to reside an equal amount of time with both parents. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 36.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, permits a designation as joint primary residential parents or a waiver of the primary residential parent designation upon agreement of the parents when the child is scheduled to reside an equal amount of time with both parents; allows the address of either parent to be used to determine school zoning when the child is scheduled to reside an equal amount of time with both parents. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 36.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-03-14HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-03-14HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-03-07HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-05SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-04SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019
2019-02-26SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-12SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/26/2019
2019-02-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/12/2019
2019-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-04SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0169 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-14 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback