TN SB0379 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes prohibition on local governments mandating that employers who do business with the local government or within its jurisdictional boundaries maintain certain sick and family leave policies. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 51, relative to leave policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Failed in Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1282 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee of Local Government Committee