TN SB0378 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits the death penalty as a punishment for defendants suffering from severe mental illness at the time of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits the death penalty as a punishment for defendants suffering from severe mental illness at the time of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateFailed in Senate Judiciary Committee
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/6/2018
2018-02-27SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-28SenateDeferred to Summer Study
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2017
2017-03-14SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2017
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2017
2017-03-08SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2017
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/8/2017
2017-03-07SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/8/2017
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2017
2017-02-08SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2017-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-02SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0345 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-08 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback