TN SB0367 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 259
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that requirement for licensure of persons who practice medicine does not prohibit a licensed nonresidential office-based opiate treatment facility from employing or contracting with a physician if the facility has a physician in the ownership structure of its controlling business entity and the employment relationship between the physician to be employed or contracted with and the nonresidential office-based opiate treatment facility is evidenced by a written contract or employment agreement containing language that does not restrict the physician from exercising independent professional medical judgment in diagnosing and treating patients. - Amends TCA Title 33, Chapter 2; Title 63 and Title 68, Chapter 11.
Title
As enacted, specifies that requirement for licensure of persons who practice medicine does not prohibit a licensed nonresidential office-based opiate treatment facility from employing or contracting with a physician if the facility has a physician in the ownership structure of its controlling business entity and the employment relationship between the physician to be employed or contracted with and the nonresidential office-based opiate treatment facility is evidenced by a written contract or employment agreement containing language that does not restrict the physician from exercising independent professional medical judgment in diagnosing and treating patients. - Amends TCA Title 33, Chapter 2; Title 63 and Title 68, Chapter 11.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 259 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 04/30/2019 | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0383) |
2019-04-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0304) |
2019-04-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0294) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0341 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 259