TN SB0366 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 30 to 25 the number of full-time creditable service years a retired schoolteacher must have served in a Tennessee public school for the retired schoolteacher's child to qualify for a tuition discount. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50 and Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, reduces from 30 to 25 the number of full-time creditable service years a retired schoolteacher must have served in a Tennessee public school for the retired schoolteacher's child to qualify for a tuition discount. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 50 and Title 49, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0346 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Failed in Education Administration & Planning