TN SB0362 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the expunction of public records regarding a motor vehicle operator's refusal to submit to breath and blood tests to determine alcohol or drug content of a motor vehicle operator's blood under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Section 40-32-101 and Section 55-10-407.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 40-32-101 and Section 55-10-407, relative to expunction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 137 | |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2023 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0412 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 04/06/2023