TN SB0356 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, under certain circumstances, waives waiting period to reschedule skills examination for applicants for school bus endorsement; revises other related requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 21 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
As introduced, under certain circumstances, waives waiting period to reschedule skills examination for applicants for school bus endorsement; revises other related requirements. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 21 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1082 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee of Transportation Committee