TN SB0350 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits an individual who is not an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces to serve as a veterans' service officer, subject to the approval of the local legislative body. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, permits an individual who is not an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces to serve as a veterans' service officer, subject to the approval of the local legislative body. - Amends TCA Title 58, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0250 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-13 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0350&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0350.pdf |