TN SB0332 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows the department to disclose information about a case to the public if all parties involved in the case, including the child, are deceased and all identifying personal information of the parties is redacted. - Amends TCA Title 10 and Section 37-5-107.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 10 and Section 37-5-107, relative to the confidentiality of records.
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Lowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 292 | |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/5/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2023 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0091 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-02 - Effective date(s) 04/28/2023