TN SB0326 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Pub. Ch. 570
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act." - Amends TCA Title 30; Title 31; Title 32; Title 34; Title 35 and Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Revised Uniform Fiduciary Access to Digital Assets Act." - Amends TCA Title 30; Title 31; Title 32; Title 34; Title 35 and Title 39.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-22 Pub. Ch. 570
2016-03-22 Effective date(s) 07/01/2016
2016-03-08SenateSigned by Governor.
2016-02-25SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2016-02-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-02-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-02-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2016-02-22HousePassed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2016-02-22HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0557)
2016-02-22HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2016-02-11HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2016-02-10SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2016-02-10SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-02-10SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2016-02-10SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0508)
2016-02-10SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0490)
2016-02-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 2/10/2016
2016-01-14SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-01-12SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2016-01-07SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 1/12/2016
2015-04-08SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 1/12/2016
2015-04-08SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/8/2015
2015-04-08SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2015-04-07SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2015
2015-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2015-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-02-03SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0774 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 570

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback